NE LB837 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the Director of Environment and Energy to provide certain Nebraska Energy Code information to the Urban Affairs Committee of the Legislature
Title
Require the Director of Environment and Energy to provide certain Nebraska Energy Code information to the Urban Affairs Committee of the Legislature
Sponsors
Sen. Megan Hunt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2022-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |