NE LB832 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Approved by Governor on March 03, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - Approved by Governor on March 03, 2010
Summary
Eliminate a private insurance requirement relating to petroleum release remedial action
Title
Eliminate a private insurance requirement relating to petroleum release remedial action
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Fischer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Approved by Governor on March 03, 2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Giese explanation of vote | |
2010-02-25 | Presented to Governor on February 25, 2010 | |
2010-02-25 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-02-25 | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-02-05 | Placed on Select File | |
2010-02-04 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-01-29 | Placed on General File | |
2010-01-14 | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2010 | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Natural Resources Committee | |
2010-01-08 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9911 |