NE LB805 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide an income tax deduction for certain wages paid to individuals convicted of a felony
Title
Provide an income tax deduction for certain wages paid to individuals convicted of a felony
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Revenue AM2571 filed |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2571 |
2020-01-30 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 29, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41216 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB805.pdf |