NE LB80 | 2024 | 108th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on August 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on August 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Property Tax Growth Limitation Act, change revenue and taxation provisions, and terminate the Property Tax Request Act
Title
Adopt the Property Tax Growth Limitation Act, change revenue and taxation provisions, and terminate the Property Tax Request Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-07-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for August 02, 2024 |
2024-07-30 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2024-07-29 | Legislature | Date of introduction |