NE LB80 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent regarding appropriations to the Department of Veterans' Affairs
Title
State intent regarding appropriations to the Department of Veterans' Affairs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB80 amended into LB814 by AM915 |
2023-05-10 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2023-03-01 | Legislature | Holdcroft name added |
2023-02-10 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-02-03 | Legislature | Day name added |
2023-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2023 |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |