NE LB80 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change motor vehicle identification inspection provisions
Title
Change motor vehicle identification inspection provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM72 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM72 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 07, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2019-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-02-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM72 adopted |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM72 filed |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM72 |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |