NE LB8 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Mobile Home Landlord and Tenant Act and provide for certificates of title and liens for abandoned mobile homes
Title
Change provisions of the Mobile Home Landlord and Tenant Act and provide for certificates of title and liens for abandoned mobile homes
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 09, 2023 |
2023-01-30 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2023-01-10 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |