NE LB795 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Approved by Governor on April 10, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to applying for membership in veterans homes
Title
Change provisions relating to applying for membership in veterans homes
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Avery [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Approved by Governor on April 10, 2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Presented to Governor on April 04, 2012 | |
2012-04-04 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-04-04 | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 | |
2012-04-02 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2012-03-30 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-03-27 | Placed on Select File | |
2012-03-22 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-02-27 | Placed on General File | |
2012-02-01 | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2012 | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Date of introduction |