NE LB785 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB785 amended into LB311 by AM1967
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB785 amended into LB311 by AM1967
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Motor Vehicle Operator's License Act
Title
Change provisions relating to the Motor Vehicle Operator's License Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB785 amended into LB311 by AM1967 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2016 |
2016-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2016-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28318 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB785.pdf |