NE LB783 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate the levy authority of community college areas
Title
Eliminate the levy authority of community college areas
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Murman [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB783 amended into LB243 by AM977 |
2023-03-08 | Legislature | Murman AM655 filed |
2023-02-02 | Legislature | Linehan FA13 filed |
2023-01-26 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM114 filed |
2023-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |