NE LB783 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Economic Development for the beef processing industry
Title
Appropriate federal funds to the Department of Economic Development for the beef processing industry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-28 | Legislature | Jacobson name added |
2022-02-25 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2022-02-02 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2022-02-02 | Legislature | Bostar name added |
2022-02-01 | Legislature | Morfeld name added |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-06 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |