NE LB783 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1104 amended into LB783 by AM2775
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1104 amended into LB783 by AM2775
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide an exemption from licensure under the Medicine and Surgery Practice Act, redefine ambulatory surgical center under the Health Care Facility Licensure Act, and redefine a term under the Health Care Quality Improvement Act
Title
Provide an exemption from licensure under the Medicine and Surgery Practice Act, redefine ambulatory surgical center under the Health Care Facility Licensure Act, and redefine a term under the Health Care Quality Improvement Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Lowe [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM2775 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM2775 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1104 amended into LB783 by AM2775 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB838 amended into LB783 by AM2775 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 10, 2020 |
2020-08-05 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 04, 2020 |
2020-08-04 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-04 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER227 adopted |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER227 filed |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER227 |
2020-07-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-07-23 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2775 adopted |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2775 filed |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2775 |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Lowe priority bill |
2020-02-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 20, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |