NE LB772 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB772 amended into LB814 by AM1730
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB772 amended into LB814 by AM1730
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Residential Youth Parenting Facility Grant Program
Title
Create the Residential Youth Parenting Facility Grant Program
Sponsors
Sen. Jana Hughes [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB772 amended into LB814 by AM1730 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-04-20 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-03-14 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM702 filed |
2023-03-14 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM702 |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2023-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |