NE LB76 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Notice of hearing for February 17, 2021
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change apportionment of Nebraska's electoral college votes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change apportionment of Nebraska's electoral college votes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 17, 2021
2021-01-21LegislatureLindstrom name added
2021-01-13LegislatureMurman name added
2021-01-11LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-01-07LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback