NE LB76 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Approved by Governor on February 13, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Approved by Governor on February 13, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Health Care Transparency Act
Title
Adopt the Health Care Transparency Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 13, 2014 |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 07, 2014 |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER127 adopted |
2014-01-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER127 filed |
2014-01-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER127 |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Nordquist AM1640 adopted |
2014-01-15 | Legislature | Nordquist AM1640 filed |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-03-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2013 |
2013-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |