NE LB755 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Approved by Governor on March 28, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Approved by Governor on March 28, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Standard Valuation Act for valuation of insurance reserves
Title
Adopt the Standard Valuation Act for valuation of insurance reserves
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gloor [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 28, 2014 |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 24, 2014 |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2014-02-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-02-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER137 adopted |
2014-02-25 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER137 filed |
2014-02-25 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER137 |
2014-02-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-02-11 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance priority bill |
2014-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2014-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2014 |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2014-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |