NE LB752 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB752 amended into LB755 by AM2991
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB752 amended into LB755 by AM2991
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide duties and programs relating to veterans
Title
Provide duties and programs relating to veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB752 amended into LB755 by AM2991 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2727 filed |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2727 |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Gragert name added |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 27, 2020 |
2020-02-11 | Legislature | Blood AM2353 filed |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | Blood AM2102 filed |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Hilkemann name added |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Bolz name added |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Crawford name added |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2020-01-09 | Legislature | Walz name added |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40665 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB752.pdf |