NE LB74 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB74 amended into LB727 by AM1152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB74 amended into LB727 by AM1152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change sales tax provisions relating to purchasing agents
Title
Change sales tax provisions relating to purchasing agents
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB74 amended into LB727 by AM1152 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-02-23 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM523 filed |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Revenue AM169 filed |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM169 |
2023-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2023 |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2023-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |