NE LB703 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB703 amended into LB705 by AM1468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB703 amended into LB705 by AM1468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the University of Nebraska
Title
Change provisions relating to the University of Nebraska
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Murman [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB703 amended into LB705 by AM1468 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Education AM1409 filed |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1409 |
2023-02-28 | Legislature | Murman AM606 filed |
2023-02-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 28, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |