NE LB701 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for telehealth practice by physicians and physician assistants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for telehealth practice by physicians and physician assistants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 11, 2018
2018-04-11LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 10, 2018
2018-04-10LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-04-10LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 45-0-4
2018-04-06LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2018-04-04LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-04-04LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER156 adopted
2018-03-28LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER156 filed
2018-03-28LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER156
2018-03-26LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-03-26LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM1880 adopted
2018-02-13LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM1880 filed
2018-02-13LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1880
2018-01-17LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 26, 2018
2018-01-08LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-05LegislatureBrewer name added
2018-01-03LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback