NE LB699 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB699 amended into LB1005 by AM2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Redefine actuarial equivalent in certain retirement acts as prescribed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redefine actuarial equivalent in certain retirement acts as prescribed

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB699 amended into LB1005 by AM2204
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-01-10LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 19, 2018
2018-01-08LegislatureReferred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
2018-01-03LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback