NE LB684 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-16 - Approved by Governor on February 11, 2010
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-16 - Approved by Governor on February 11, 2010
Summary
Revisor bill to repeal sections that terminated in 2000 governing the Contribution Distributive Fund and the Social Security Cash Fund
Title
Revisor bill to repeal sections that terminated in 2000 governing the Contribution Distributive Fund and the Social Security Cash Fund
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Approved by Governor on February 11, 2010 | |
2010-02-05 | Presented to Governor on February 05, 2010 | |
2010-02-05 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-02-05 | Passed on Final Reading 43-0-6 | |
2010-02-05 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2010-01-21 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-01-19 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-01-13 | Placed on Select File | |
2010-01-11 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-01-08 | Placed on General File | |
2010-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9497 |