NE LB682 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the New Markets Job Growth Investment Act
Title
Change the New Markets Job Growth Investment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Legislature - Linehan AM1433 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Legislature - Revenue AM195 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Legislature - Linehan AM1433 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Legislature - Revenue AM195 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Linehan AM1433 adopted |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Linehan AM1433 filed |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER72 adopted |
2021-04-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER72 filed |
2021-04-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER72 |
2021-04-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-04-26 | Legislature | Revenue AM195 adopted |
2021-04-26 | Legislature | Pending |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2021-03-02 | Legislature | Revenue AM195 filed |
2021-03-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM195 |
2021-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |