NE LB681 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 10, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to legislative subpoenas

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to legislative subpoenas

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 42-0-7 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Legislature - Executive Board AM3149 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-11LegislatureApproved by Governor on August 10, 2020
2020-08-05LegislaturePresented to Governor on August 04, 2020
2020-08-04LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2020-08-04LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 42-0-7
2020-07-31LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2020-07-30LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-07-30LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER232 adopted
2020-07-27LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER232 filed
2020-07-27LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER232
2020-07-23LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-07-23LegislatureHunt MO190 withdrawn
2020-07-23LegislatureHunt MO190 Recommit to the Executive Board filed
2020-07-23LegislatureExecutive Board AM3149 adopted
2020-07-22LegislatureExecutive Board AM3149 filed
2020-07-22LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM3149
2020-02-19LegislatureExecutive Board priority bill
2020-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2019-02-20LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 28, 2019
2019-01-25LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2019-01-23LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback