NE LB680 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Uniform Civil Remedies for Unauthorized Disclosure of Intimate Images Act
Title
Adopt the Uniform Civil Remedies for Unauthorized Disclosure of Intimate Images Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1537 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Legislature - Judiciary AM1537 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST38 |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER128 adopted |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER128 filed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER128 |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1537 adopted |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1537 filed |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1537 |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | DeBoer priority bill |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |