NE LB67 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Approved by Governor on March 06, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Approved by Governor on March 06, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to determination of municipality population thresholds and references to cities, villages, and governing bodies
Title
Change provisions relating to determination of municipality population thresholds and references to cities, villages, and governing bodies
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 06, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-01-29 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |