NE LB667 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Youth Opportunities in Learning and Occupations Act
Title
Adopt the Youth Opportunities in Learning and Occupations Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM3384 filed |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM3384 |
2020-07-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for August 06, 2020 on AM3238 |
2020-07-29 | Legislature | Vargas AM3238 filed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37908 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB667.pdf |