NE LB651 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Vargas AM1388 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Nebraska Reading Improvement Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Nebraska Reading Improvement Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11LegislatureVargas AM1388 filed
2017-05-11LegislatureChambers MO139 pending
2017-05-11LegislatureChambers MO139 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed
2017-05-11LegislatureChambers MO138 failed
2017-05-11LegislatureChambers MO138 Bracket until May 25, 2017 filed
2017-05-10LegislatureLinehan AM1394 filed
2017-05-10LegislaturePansing Brooks AM1368 filed
2017-05-10LegislatureHarr AM1367 filed
2017-05-02LegislatureLinehan AM1226 filed
2017-05-02LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-05-02LegislatureLinehan MO103 prevailed
2017-05-02LegislatureHarr motion to overrule Chair withdrawn
2017-05-02LegislatureChair ruled there had been full and fair debate on Linehan MO103
2017-04-25LegislatureLinehan MO103 Place on General File filed
2017-03-09LegislatureLinehan priority bill
2017-02-16LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 07, 2017
2017-01-20LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2017-01-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback