NE LB651 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-10 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change liability for certain court costs as prescribed
Title
Change liability for certain court costs as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2015-01-29 | Legislature | Groene name added |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |