NE LB636 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a discounted permit under the Game Law for deployed military members and spouses on leave
Title
Provide for a discounted permit under the Game Law for deployed military members and spouses on leave
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-02-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 12, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |