NE LB626 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB626 amended into LB741 by AM1683
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB626 amended into LB741 by AM1683
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Child and Maternal Death Review Act
Title
Change provisions of the Child and Maternal Death Review Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB626 amended into LB741 by AM1683 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM642 filed |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM642 |
2021-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |