NE LB62 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1237 amended into LB62 by AM2878
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1237 amended into LB62 by AM2878
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for coverage of translation and interpretation services under the medical assistance program, change reporting requirements related to the medical assistance program, and require a report regarding to the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program
Title
Provide for coverage of translation and interpretation services under the medical assistance program, change reporting requirements related to the medical assistance program, and require a report regarding to the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 34-6-9 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. AM2878 adopted (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM644 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. AM2762 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. AM2878 adopted (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM644 adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. AM2762 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1237 amended into LB62 by AM2878 |
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB871 amended into LB62 by AM2878 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 34-6-9 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-04-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-04-05 | Legislature | Hunt AM2824 withdrawn |
2024-04-05 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1243 withdrawn |
2024-04-05 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1242 withdrawn |
2024-04-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER90 adopted |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER90 filed |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER90 |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1243 Recommit to the Health and Human Services Committee filed |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1242 Bracket until April 10, 2024 filed |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM2878 adopted |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM2547 withdrawn |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM644 adopted |
2024-03-07 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM2762 adopted |
2024-03-06 | Legislature | Hunt AM2824 filed |
2024-03-05 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM2878 filed |
2024-03-05 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM2762 to AM644 filed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM2547 filed |
2024-02-15 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. priority bill |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM644 filed |
2024-02-14 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM644 |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-04-20 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-02-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2023 |
2023-01-31 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |