NE LB618 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redefine public benefits and change provisions of the Employment Security Law relating to the disqualification of certain aliens
Title
Redefine public benefits and change provisions of the Employment Security Law relating to the disqualification of certain aliens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-04-20 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2023-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2023 |
2023-01-31 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |