NE LB616 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Approved by Governor on May 08, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Approved by Governor on May 08, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide an interest payment exception for certain state highway and bridge construction contracts
Title
Provide an interest payment exception for certain state highway and bridge construction contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM442 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM442 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 08, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 02, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Passed over |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER81 adopted |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER81 filed |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER81 |
2019-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-10 | Legislature | Hilgers AM203 withdrawn |
2019-04-10 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM442 adopted |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Hilgers priority bill |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM442 filed |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM442 |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Hilgers AM203 filed |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |