NE LB610A | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2019-05-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-05-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |