NE LB604 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to reimbursement to political subdivisions under the Governor's Emergency Program
Title
Change provisions relating to reimbursement to political subdivisions under the Governor's Emergency Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | Legislature | Bill withdrawn |
2015-02-11 | Legislature | Bloomfield MO26 prevailed |
2015-02-10 | Legislature | Bloomfield MO26 Withdraw bill filed |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |