NE LB599 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to recycling under the Environmental Protection Act and the Integrated Solid Waste Management Act and provide for an additional use of the Waste Reduction and Recycling Incentive Fund
Title
Change provisions relating to recycling under the Environmental Protection Act and the Integrated Solid Waste Management Act and provide for an additional use of the Waste Reduction and Recycling Incentive Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-04-17 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM383 filed |
2023-04-17 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM383 |
2023-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2023 |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |