NE LB59 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-15 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-15 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redefine state aid value for purposes of the Tax Equity and Educational Opportunities Support Act
Title
Redefine state aid value for purposes of the Tax Equity and Educational Opportunities Support Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Bill withdrawn |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Scheer MO2 prevailed |
2015-01-14 | Legislature | Scheer MO2 Withdraw bill filed |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2015-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |