NE LB580 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Redistricting Act
Title
Adopt the Redistricting Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 29-15-5 (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Communication |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Returned by Governor without approval on April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 13, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 29-15-5 |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Murante MO290 prevailed |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Murante MO290 Invoke cloture filed |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Bloomfield AM2925 withdrawn |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Bloomfield AM2925 filed |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File failed |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Kintner FA124 withdrawn |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Kintner FA124 filed |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER247 adopted |
2016-04-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER247 filed |
2016-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER247 |
2016-04-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-04-04 | Legislature | Murante AM2800 adopted |
2016-04-04 | Legislature | Executive Board AM1961 adopted |
2016-03-31 | Legislature | Murante AM2800 filed |
2016-02-22 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Executive Board AM1961 filed |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1961 |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 27, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |