NE LB560 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB623 amended into LB560 by AM1414
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to tax credits under the Beginning Farmer Tax Credit Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to tax credits under the Beginning Farmer Tax Credit Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Legislature - Revenue AM1414 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB623 amended into LB560 by AM1414
2019-05-21LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 17, 2019
2019-05-13LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 13, 2019
2019-05-13LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2019-05-13LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 46-0-3
2019-05-13LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2019-05-07LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2019-05-02LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2019-05-02LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER97 adopted
2019-04-30LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER97 filed
2019-04-30LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER97
2019-04-24LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2019-04-24LegislatureRevenue AM1414 adopted
2019-04-17LegislatureRevenue AM1414 filed
2019-04-17LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1414
2019-03-19LegislatureLegislative Performance Audit priority bill
2019-03-13LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 20, 2019
2019-01-24LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2019-01-22LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback