NE LB558 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB558 amended into LB528 by AM556
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB558 amended into LB528 by AM556
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Alternative Certification for Quality Teachers Act
Title
Adopt the Alternative Certification for Quality Teachers Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB558 amended into LB528 by AM556 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |