NE LB540 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require a medicaid waiver relating to family planning services
Title
Require a medicaid waiver relating to family planning services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-02-08 | Enrollment and Review ER173 filed | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on Select File with ER173 | |
2012-02-07 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-02-07 | Harr AM1903 lost | |
2012-02-07 | Harr AM1903 filed | |
2012-02-07 | Health and Human Services AM1719 adopted | |
2012-02-07 | Fulton AM1859 adopted | |
2012-02-06 | Council name added | |
2012-02-06 | Fulton AM1859 pending | |
2012-02-06 | Fulton AM1859 filed | |
2012-02-06 | Health and Human Services AM1719 pending | |
2012-01-23 | Health and Human Services AM1719 filed | |
2012-01-23 | Placed on General File with AM1719 | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-01-25 | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2011 | |
2011-01-20 | Krist name withdrawn | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12227 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB540.pdf |