NE LB531 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change distribution of sales and use tax revenue and repeal the Build Nebraska Act
Title
Change distribution of sales and use tax revenue and repeal the Build Nebraska Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill. |
2013-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 27, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18240 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB531.pdf |