NE LB500 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit participation in pretrial diversion programs for certain driving under the influence and driver's license offenses
Title
Prohibit participation in pretrial diversion programs for certain driving under the influence and driver's license offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37751 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB500.pdf |