NE LB481 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Approved by Governor on May 09, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Approved by Governor on May 09, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for drug product selection for interchangeable biological products
Title
Provide for drug product selection for interchangeable biological products
Sponsors
Sen. John Kuehn [N] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 09, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 03, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-19 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER56 adopted |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER56 filed |
2017-04-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER56 |
2017-04-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2017-02-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2017 |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |