NE LB478 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Approved by Governor on May 09, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Approved by Governor on May 09, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for possession of archery equipment and knives for recreational purposes
Title
Provide for possession of archery equipment and knives for recreational purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 09, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 03, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-19 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Legislature | Groene AM988 adopted |
2017-04-13 | Legislature | Groene AM988 filed |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Schumacher FA59 adopted |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Schumacher FA59 filed |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2017-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2017 |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |