NE LB47 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Placed on General File with AM64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change procedures relating to obligees in child support proceedings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change procedures relating to obligees in child support proceedings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM64
2021-02-16LegislatureJudiciary AM64 filed
2021-01-19LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 29, 2021
2021-01-11LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-01-07LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback