NE LB469 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Fantasy Contests Act
Title
Adopt the Fantasy Contests Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Chambers MO174 Recommit to General Affairs Committee filed |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Larson MO171 pending |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Larson MO171 Reconsider the vote on FA89 filed |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Chambers FA89 lost |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Chambers FA89 pending |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | General Affairs AM155 pending |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Chambers FA89 filed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-23 | Legislature | Larson AM79 filed |
2017-02-23 | Legislature | Larson AM77 filed |
2017-02-22 | Legislature | General Affairs AM155 filed |
2017-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM155 |
2017-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2017 |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31319 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB469.pdf |