NE LB450A | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - McKinney AM2196 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - McKinney AM2196 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2022-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | McKinney AM2196 adopted |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | McKinney AM2196 filed |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | McKinney AM2148 withdrawn |
2022-03-03 | Legislature | McKinney AM2148 filed |
2022-03-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-02-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2022-02-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-02-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-02-02 | Legislature | Date of introduction |