NE LB450 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1215 amended into LB450 by AM1943
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1215 amended into LB450 by AM1943
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Nebraska Innovation Hub Act and the Small Business Assistance Act
Title
Adopt the Nebraska Innovation Hub Act and the Small Business Assistance Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Legislature - Geist AM1943 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Legislature - Business and Labor AM739 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Legislature - McKinney AM1600 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Legislature - Geist AM1943 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Legislature - Business and Labor AM739 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Legislature - McKinney AM1600 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1215 amended into LB450 by AM1943 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST45 |
2022-03-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-03 | Legislature | Geist AM1943 adopted |
2022-02-16 | Legislature | Geist AM1943 filed |
2022-01-27 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2022-01-27 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2022-01-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM739 adopted |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | McKinney AM1600 adopted |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | McKinney AM1600 filed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | McKinney priority bill |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM739 filed |
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM739 |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |